U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00302-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAYLOR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 04, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2023
  • December 21, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • December 20, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 04, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • December 04, 2023: [Order]
  • December 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2023
  • November 14, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 08, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 07, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 07, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • November 06, 2023: [Detention]
  • November 06, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 06, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 02, 2023: [Detainer Lodged]
  • November 02, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.