U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00355-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROADEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2024
  • January 04, 2024: [Order]
  • January 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2023
  • December 26, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • December 14, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 08, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2023
  • November 08, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2023: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.