U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00360-2
  • Case Name: USA v. HARRIS, ET AL.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2023
  • December 15, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 06, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • December 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2023
  • November 16, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2023: [Order]
  • November 15, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 15, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • November 15, 2023: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 15, 2023: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.