U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00352-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BIAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2024
  • November 07, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2024: [In Limine]
  • January 17, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • January 17, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 17, 2024: [Notice of Jurors Profiles]
  • January 17, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 16, 2024: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 12, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 12, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • January 12, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued ]
November, 2023
  • November 27, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 16, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2023: [Order]
  • November 15, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2023: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.