U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00391-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 15, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 15, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 03, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 03, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [Status Report ]
  • January 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2024
  • December 03, 2024: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
October, 2024
  • October 13, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2024
  • January 19, 2024: [Order]
  • January 19, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 17, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2024: [Order]
  • January 17, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2023
  • December 11, 2023: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2023: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.