U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00383-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THORNTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 09, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 04, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 03, 2024: [Order]
  • January 03, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2023
  • December 18, 2023: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • December 07, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 05, 2023: [Detention]
  • December 05, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • December 05, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.