U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00388-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LINDSAY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2024
  • January 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2023
  • December 27, 2023: [Order]
  • December 27, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 06, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 06, 2023: [Order]
  • December 05, 2023: [Order]
  • December 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2023: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.