U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00401-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ELLINGTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 20, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 18, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 11, 2025: [Variance]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Continue Trial]
January, 2024
  • January 16, 2024: [Order]
  • January 16, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2024: [Order]
  • January 11, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 09, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 09, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2023
  • December 21, 2023: [Order]
  • December 21, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 21, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • December 20, 2023: [Detention]
  • December 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 07, 2023: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.