U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00394-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HUGGINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 07, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • March 25, 2025: [Variance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Order]
  • January 18, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 18, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2023
  • December 12, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 12, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 12, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 12, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.