U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00295-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WHEELER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 09, 2024: [Strike]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 27, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2024: [Transcript]
January, 2024
  • January 17, 2024: [Bill of Particulars]
December, 2023
  • December 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2023: [Continue Trial]
  • December 12, 2023: [Order on Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.