U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00164-2
  • Case Name: USA v. McDaniel, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 06, 2024: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 04, 2024: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • October 03, 2024: [Objection]
January, 2024
  • January 19, 2024: [Arrest - Other District]
  • January 19, 2024: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.