U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ayeni, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Transcript]
December, 2024
  • December 15, 2024: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 03, 2024: [Indictment]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
September, 2024
  • September 29, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2024: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 27, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • January 18, 2024: [Detain]
  • January 18, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.