U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McCarroll, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Transcript Information Form]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 29, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for New Trial ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Acquittal ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Non-Appeal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Allocution ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 02, 2025: [New Trial ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 31, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • March 19, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response]
February, 2025
  • February 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
November, 2024
  • November 26, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 11, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 08, 2024: [Acquittal]
October, 2024
  • October 22, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 14, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 10, 2024: [Sever Defendant]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Subpoena]
  • October 10, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • October 10, 2024: [In Limine]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • October 10, 2024: [Subpoena]
  • October 10, 2024: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • October 10, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
  • October 09, 2024: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 07, 2024: [Jury Trial]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • October 07, 2024: [In Limine]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 06, 2024: [Trial Brief ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Terminating Attorney]
  • October 02, 2024: [Postpone Sentencing]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 30, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Declaration of Mistrial ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • September 30, 2024: [Jury Selection]
  • September 30, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 30, 2024: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 30, 2024: [Declaration of Mistrial ]
  • September 29, 2024: [Sever Defendant]
  • September 29, 2024: [Adopt Motion]
  • September 29, 2024: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • September 28, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 28, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • September 27, 2024: [Sever Defendant]
  • September 27, 2024: [Adopt Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • September 27, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2024: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 26, 2024: [Proposed Voir Dire]
January, 2024
  • January 18, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 18, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 18, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • January 18, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.