U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanders, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Electronic Availability of ROA]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2024: [Downward Departure]
October, 2024
  • October 16, 2024: [Letter - Correspondence]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • October 11, 2024: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2024: [Transcript - Appeal]
January, 2024
  • January 19, 2024: [Consent to Jury Selection by US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 18, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.