U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00118-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gilreath
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 29, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 29, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Exparte Document - use ONLY with other selection]
  • March 18, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Strike]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Jury Trial]
  • October 02, 2024: [Jury Selection]
  • October 02, 2024: [Jury Verdict ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Jury Instructions ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • October 01, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 01, 2024: [Jury Trial]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
  • October 01, 2024: [Acquittal ]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Juror Questionnaire Certification]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.