U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00293-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • March 26, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • March 14, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • March 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • March 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
October, 2024
  • October 16, 2024: [Continue Trial]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 27, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2024: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.