U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00123-8
  • Case Name: USA v. HAIRSTON, ET AL.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
  • March 17, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 17, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 12, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 11, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • March 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
  • March 03, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
February, 2025
  • February 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 09, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 09, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 09, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 09, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • October 09, 2024: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • October 09, 2024: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 09, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 09, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • October 09, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 08, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • October 08, 2024: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 08, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue Trial]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Jurors Profiles]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.