U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00212-5
  • Case Name: USA v. HUDSON, ET AL.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Downward Departure - SEALED - 5K1.1 ONLY]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Transcript Order Form]
December, 2024
  • December 24, 2024: [Travel]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 03, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • October 03, 2024: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 03, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • October 02, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 01, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • October 01, 2024: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 01, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.