U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FRANKLIN-MIMS, ET AL.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 08, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 08, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • October 03, 2024: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 03, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.