U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00287-4
  • Case Name: USA v. CARTER, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 05, 2025: [Strike]
  • May 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Jurors Profiles]
  • May 01, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 01, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 24, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 22, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
January, 2025
  • January 04, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 02, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 26, 2024: [Response to Court Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.