U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00216-15
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 11, 2024: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2024: [Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 01, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • September 27, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2024: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • September 25, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • September 25, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.