U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Busby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Document Referred]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • September 26, 2024: [Continue-Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.