U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00190-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Contreras, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • March 20, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [Amend/Correct ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • September 26, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.