U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McGee, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order to Produce]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • May 03, 2025: [Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • May 03, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 03, 2025: [Suppress]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Proof of Publication]
  • April 25, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Proof of Publication]
  • April 15, 2025: [Proof of Publication]
  • April 14, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 20, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 10, 2025: [Unseal Document]
  • March 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2025: [Document Referred]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 14, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [Notice of 404(b) Evidence]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice of Filing Exhibits]
  • October 02, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 02, 2024: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 01, 2024: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 01, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 01, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 01, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2024: [Detain]
  • October 01, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2024: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.