U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00114-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Castille, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 09, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 08, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 31, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 31, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 27, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Proof of Publication]
  • March 18, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 18, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: [Document Referred]
December, 2024
  • December 07, 2024: [Notice of 404(b) Evidence]
  • December 07, 2024: [Information to Establish Prior Conviction]
  • December 03, 2024: [Order]
November, 2024
  • November 25, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • October 11, 2024: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 11, 2024: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 03, 2024: [Detain]
  • October 03, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • October 03, 2024: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Interpreter Needed]
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.