U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • October 10, 2024: [Amend/Correct ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.