U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Landrum
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 26, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
December, 2024
  • December 19, 2024: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
November, 2024
  • November 14, 2024: [Consent to Jury Selection by US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 07, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Pretrial Conference]
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • October 01, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2024: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 01, 2024: [Information - Felony]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 30, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 27, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • September 26, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.