U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 02, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment from Court Reporter]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript Information Form]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Proof of Publication]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment from Court Reporter]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
February, 2025
  • February 19, 2025: [Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • October 08, 2024: [Response]
  • October 08, 2024: [Dismiss ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Bench Trial - Begun ]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Trial Brief ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.