U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tate
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 11, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • October 03, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 03, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2024: [Arraignment ]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 26, 2024: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.