U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whittenton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • October 01, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • October 01, 2024: [Withdraw]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2024: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • September 30, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 30, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.