U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00137-7
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 29, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 08, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Revoke]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Proof of Publication]
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Factual Resume]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Factual Resume]
  • March 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [Motions Referred]
October, 2024
  • October 18, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 09, 2024: [Appear]
  • October 08, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2024: [Reconsideration ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • October 03, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 02, 2024: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 02, 2024: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order to Produce]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • September 27, 2024: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 27, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 27, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.