U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00153-2
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 17, 2025: [Objection]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2024: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 02, 2024: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.