U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00077-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Grimes et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 02, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • May 01, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • May 01, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 09, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Seal Case]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 05, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 31, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
January, 2025
  • January 26, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • January 05, 2025: [Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Arraignment ]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry by MJ (Text Only)]
  • September 27, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 27, 2024: [Arraignment ]
  • September 27, 2024: [Consent to Plea before M/J]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2024: [Indictment]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.