U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fisher, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • October 02, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • September 30, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2024: [Document Referred]
  • September 29, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 25, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.