U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00361-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRANT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 06, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 07, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 01, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Continue]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • September 29, 2024: [Continue]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Reconsideration]
  • September 27, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2024: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 27, 2024: [Arrest ]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2024: [Detention]
  • September 27, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.