U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00363-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOWARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 13, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 12, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 12, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 02, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2024: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • September 27, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 27, 2024: [Arrest ]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 27, 2024: [Detention]
  • September 27, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.