U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00205-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 30, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 30, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 03, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Oral Order]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Process Receipt and Return]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.