U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00299-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bellefleur
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Response to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.