U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00303-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WASHINGTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 16, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 10, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • October 08, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.