U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00368-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Childers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2024: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • September 30, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.