U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00006-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 18, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 03, 2024: [Extension of Time]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.