U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 09, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order to Produce]
  • October 02, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • October 02, 2024: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • October 02, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.