U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00118-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Melton et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment from Court Reporter]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Transcript Information Form]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 21, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appeal Instructions]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sentencing]
February, 2025
  • February 08, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Produce ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • October 07, 2024: [Produce ]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • September 30, 2024: [Status Conference]
  • September 27, 2024: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry by MJ (Text Only)]
  • September 27, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 27, 2024: [Consent to Plea before M/J]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.