U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [In Limine]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 02, 2025: [Produce ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Return of Service .....]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Declaration of Mistrial ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Jury Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Jury Verdict Redacted]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Acquittal ]
  • April 15, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 15, 2025: [Acquittal]
  • April 14, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Jury Selection]
  • April 11, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Strike ]
  • April 07, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response]
  • April 06, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of 404(b) Evidence]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 02, 2025: [In Limine]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Conference]
  • March 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.