U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lacey et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript Acknowledgment from Court Reporter]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Transcript Information Form]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Letter - Correspondence]
  • March 12, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2025
  • February 20, 2025: [Reply to Response]
January, 2025
  • January 12, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
October, 2024
  • October 05, 2024: [Transcript]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • September 27, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • September 27, 2024: [Amend/Correct ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.