U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00346-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wallace
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: [Extend Time]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 11, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 10, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 10, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2024: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.