U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crook, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amend/Correct ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Proof of Publication]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2025: [Postpone Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 19, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 10, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
February, 2025
  • February 20, 2025: [Document Referred]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.