U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Proof of Publication]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motions Referred]
  • October 04, 2024: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
September, 2024
  • September 29, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.