U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOONE, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 20, 2025: [Seal]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 08, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 08, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • October 08, 2024: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • October 08, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 08, 2024: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.