U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00318-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reduction in Criminal Offense Level]
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Response to Court Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order on Arraignment]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 30, 2024: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2024: [Oral Order]
  • September 30, 2024: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 30, 2024: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • September 30, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.